Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB461
Introduced on: Mar 19, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parks , Kirkpatrick , Koivisto , McClain , Pierce , Anderson , Arberry , Atkinson , Buckley , Claborn , Conklin , Denis , Gerhardt , Hardy , Hogan , Horne , Kihuen , Leslie , Manendo , Mortenson , Oceguera , Ohrenschall , Womack
Makes certain changes concerning sales and use taxes. (BDR S-1333)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Bill became law pursuant to Nevada Constitution Article 4, Section 35.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Apr. 10, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Government Affairs     May. 14, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Government Affairs     May. 16, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 23   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 25   Yea 11,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint             As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 595
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 803
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. CA12

Bill History

Mar 19, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 20, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 595.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 24, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 22, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 23, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 803.) To printer.

May 24, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 10.) To Assembly.

May 26, 2007

  • In Assembly.

May 29, 2007

  • Senate Amendment No. 803 not concurred in. To Senate.

May 30, 2007

  • In Senate.

May 31, 2007

  • Senate Amendment No. 803 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.

Jun 01, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.

Jun 03, 2007

  • From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 803 and further amend. First Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • First Conference report not adopted by Senate.

Jun 04, 2007

  • Action of refusal of concurrence rescinded.
  • First Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 07, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 18, 2007

  • Chapter 545.
  • (Bill became law pursuant to Nevada Constitution Article 4, Section 35.)
  • Sections 3 to 22, inclusive, and 23 of this act effective: (a) June 18, 2007, for purposes of enacting ordinances and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and (b) October 1, 2007, for all other purposes. Sections 1 and 2 of this act effective October 1, 2007, and expire by limitation on October 1, 2025. Sections 3 to 22, inclusive, of this act expire by limitation on October 1, 2027.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo