Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB384
Introduced on: Mar 19, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Cegavske , Beers , Raggio , Titus , Heck , Amodei , Care , Coffin , Hardy , Horsford , Lee , Mathews , McGinness , Nolan , Rhoads , Schneider , Townsend , Washington , Wiener , Woodhouse
Clarifies that certain relationships between persons with disabilities and training or rehabilitation centers do not constitute employment for the purposes of provisions governing the minimum wage. (BDR 53-1103)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 159.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 23, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 09, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Mar. 28   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 21   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                             As Enrolled        

Bill History

Mar 19, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 20, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 26, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 27, 2007

  • Read second time.

Mar 28, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Mar 29, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 11, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 14, 2007

  • Read second time.

May 15, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 16, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 17, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 21, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 22, 2007

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 23, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor.

May 30, 2007

  • Chapter 159.
  • Effective May 29, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo