Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB385
Introduced on: Mar 19, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Cegavske , Beers , Heck , Raggio
Revises certain provisions relating to voter identification. (BDR 24-447)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar. 27, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar. 29, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Finance     May. 03, 2007     03:00 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Finance     May. 08, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Finance     May. 11, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Mentioned Not Agendized .
       
 
Votes
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Proposed Amendment: Amend. No. 489
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 489

Bill History

Mar 19, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 20, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 10, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 19, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 23, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 489.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 05, 2007

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo