Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SJR7
Introduced on: Mar 19, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Beers
Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution by adding the provisions of the Tax and Spending Control for Nevada initiative. (BDR C-1324)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Apr. 09, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Not Heard .
  Senate Finance     Apr. 13, 2007     07:30 AM    Minutes      Do pass, failed .
       
 
Votes
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                                    

Bill History

Mar 19, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Mar 20, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2007

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo