Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB470
Introduced on: Mar 19, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Pierce , Parks , Koivisto , Arberry , Claborn , Kirkpatrick , McClain , Ohrenschall , Segerblom , Horsford , Titus
Prohibits the Governor or any other state officer or employee from binding the State to the requirements of an international trade agreement without authorization by the Legislature. (BDR 19-1280)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 10, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 12, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Rescheduled .
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 13, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 01, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 17, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass, failed .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 18   Yea 34,   Nay 7,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                                    

Bill History

Mar 19, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 20, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 13, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 16, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 18, 2007

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 7, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

Apr 19, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 19, 2007

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo