Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB404
Introduced on: Mar 19, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Washington
Revises provisions governing homeschooled children. (BDR 34-738)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 513.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Human Resources and Education     Apr. 06, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Human Resources and Education     Apr. 11, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Finance     May. 01, 2007     04:00 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Finance     May. 03, 2007     03:00 PM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Assembly Education     May. 23, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Education     May. 30, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    May. 15   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    Jun. 01   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint     4th Reprint         As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 345
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 688
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 1082
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. CA36

Bill History

Mar 19, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Human Resources and Education. To printer.

Mar 20, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 05, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 19, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 345.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 20, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 08, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.

May 09, 2007

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 10, 2007

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 14, 2007

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 688.) To printer.

May 15, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 16, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

Jun 01, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1082.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.

Jun 02, 2007

  • Assembly Amendment No. 1082 not concurred in. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 1082 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.

Jun 03, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.

Jun 04, 2007

  • From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 1082 and further amend.
  • First Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • First Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 07, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 14, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 513.
  • Effective July 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | Current NELIS | Previous NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2016 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo