Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB409
Introduced on: Mar 19, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Titus , Wiener , Carlton , Coffin , Horsford , Lee , Mathews , Nolan , Raggio , Rhoads , Schneider , Townsend , Woodhouse , Allen , Parnell , Buckley , Smith , Gerhardt , Gansert , Kirkpatrick , Koivisto , Leslie , Pierce
Revises provisions governing insurance coverage for a vaccine to protect against cervical cancer and screenings for prostate cancer. (BDR 57-1077)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.
CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 527.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 03, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 09, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 07, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 16, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 28, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Concur .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr. 13   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    Apr. 19   Yea 14,   Nay 7,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 25   Yea 36,   Nay 6,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendments Amend. No.498
Adopted Amendments Amend. No.924

Bill History

Mar 19, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 20, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 10, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 11, 2007

  • Read second time.

Apr 12, 2007

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 13, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.)
  • Notice of reconsideration on next legislative day.

Apr 16, 2007

  • Action reconsidered.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Apr 18, 2007

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 498.) To printer.

Apr 19, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 14, Nays: 7.) To Assembly.

Apr 20, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 924.) To printer.

May 24, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 6.) To Senate.

May 26, 2007

  • In Senate.

May 29, 2007

  • Assembly Amendment No. 924 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 30, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 14, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 15, 2007

  • Chapter 527.
  • Effective July 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | Current NELIS | Previous NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo