Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB416
Introduced on: Mar 19, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Lee
Creates the Fund to Stabilize the Operation of Public Schools. (BDR 34-1304)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Apr. 09, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
       
 
Votes
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                                    

Bill History

Mar 19, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Mar 20, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 26, 2007

  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 05, 2007

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo