Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB549
Introduced on: Mar 26, 2007
By: Legislative Operations and Elections
Makes various changes to provisions governing certain petitions. (BDR 24-1382)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 484.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr. 03, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr. 12, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     May. 03, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 29, 2007     03:30 PM    Minutes      Concur .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr. 24   Yea 18,   Nay 3,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 25   Yea 40,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendments Amend. No.466
Adopted Amendments Amend. No.687

Bill History

Mar 26, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 28, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 12, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 466.) To printer.

Apr 24, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 3.) To Assembly.

Apr 25, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To committee.

May 15, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 16, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 687.) To printer.

May 17, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 21, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 2.) To Senate.

May 26, 2007

  • In Senate.

May 30, 2007

  • Assembly Amendment No. 687 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 31, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 14, 2007

  • Chapter 484.
  • Effective July 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | Current NELIS | Previous NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo