Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB94
Introduced on: Feb 12, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Leslie , Buckley , Bobzien , Carpenter , Parks , Anderson , Horne , Munford , Oceguera , Ohrenschall , Pierce , Smith , Care , Titus
Revises provisions relating to administrative procedure. (BDR 18-219)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 164.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Feb. 23, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Government Affairs     Feb. 26, 2007     10:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Judiciary     May. 03, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 18   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 22   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 13

Bill History

Feb 12, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Feb 13, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 17, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 13.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Not voting: 1.) To Senate.

Apr 19, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 16, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 17, 2007

  • Read second time.

May 22, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 23, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor.

May 30, 2007

  • Chapter 164.
  • Effective May 29, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo