Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB422
Introduced on: Mar 19, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Titus
Requires the establishment of a registry of greenhouse gas emissions and an inventory of greenhouse gases released in this State. (BDR 40-678)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 417.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr. 11, 2007     03:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr. 13, 2007     03:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Finance     May. 03, 2007     03:00 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Finance     May. 08, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Finance     May. 11, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Mentioned Not Agendized .
  Senate Finance     May. 14, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned Not Agendized .
  Senate Finance     May. 15, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Mentioned Not Agendized .
  Senate Finance     May. 21, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May. 30, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Finance     Jun. 02, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Concur .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    May. 24   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 31   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint             As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 423
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 939
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 1081

Bill History

Mar 19, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.

Mar 20, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 30, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 423.) To printer.

Apr 24, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Taken from General File. Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 22, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 23, 2007

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 939.) To printer.

May 24, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee.

May 31, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1081.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.)
  • To printer.

Jun 01, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.

Jun 03, 2007

  • Assembly Amendment No. 1081 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 04, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 14, 2007

  • Chapter 417.
  • Effective July 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo