SB146* of the 74th Session
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 02, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
McGinness

Authorizes the boards of county commissioners of certain counties to levy an ad valorem tax to pay the costs of operating a regional facility for the detention of children. (BDR 31-937)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Bill read. Veto sustained. (Yeas: None, Nays: 20, Excused: 1.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings

Final Passage Votes

Votes in Response to Governor's Veto  (2/3 Majority Required)
   Senate Override (Not Sustain)     (As Introduced)    Feb. 19   Yea 0,   Nay 20,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 02, 2009

  • Returned from Secretary of State.
  • Made Special Order of Business for Wednesday, February 11, 2009, at 11:15 a.m.

Feb 11, 2009

  • Taken from Special Orders. Made Special Order of Business for Thursday, February 19, 2009, at 11:15 a.m..

Feb 19, 2009