SB116
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 03, 2009.
By: Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation

Makes failure to wear a safety belt in a motor vehicle a primary offense. (BDR 43-20)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Feb. 19, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Transportation     Apr. 14, 2009     02:00 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Transportation     Apr. 23, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do Pass, failed

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Feb. 24   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 03, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To printer.

Feb 04, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Feb 20, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Feb 23, 2009

  • Read second time.

Feb 24, 2009

Feb 25, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)