AB218
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 27, 2009.
By: Judiciary

Makes various changes relating to gaming. (BDR 41-603)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 434.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb. 27, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 27, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Judiciary     May. 11, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May. 14, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Judiciary     May. 20, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Senate Judiciary     May. 21, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Senate Judiciary     May. 28, 2009     07:06 PM    Minutes          Recede

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 21   Yea 31,   Nay 10,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 22   Yea 17,   Nay 2,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.913     Amend. No.918     Amend. No.933     Amend. No.931   

Bill History

Feb 27, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 02, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 27, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 30, 2009

  • Read second time.

Mar 31, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 01, 2009

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 16, 2009

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 17, 2009

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 21, 2009

Apr 22, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 22, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 913.)
  • Action of adoption of amendment rescinded.
  • Read third time.
  • Amended. (Amend. Nos. 918, 933 and 931.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 2, Excused: 1, Not voting: 1.)
  • To printer.

May 23, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.

May 26, 2009

  • Senate Amendment No. 918 concurred in.
  • Senate Amendment Nos. 931 and 933 not concurred in. To Senate.

May 28, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Senate Amendment Nos. 931 and 933 receded from.
  • To Assembly.

May 29, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To enrollment.

Jun 01, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 03, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 434.
  • Effective June 3, 2009.