AJR7
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Aizley , McClain , Kirkpatrick , Koivisto , Buckley , Arberry , Atkinson , Bobzien , Claborn , Conklin , Dondero Loop , Goicoechea , Grady , Hogan , Horne , Kihuen , Mortenson , Munford , Ohrenschall , Parnell , Pierce , Segerblom , Smith

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to repeal provisions relating to lotteries. (BDR C-1040)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Mar. 26, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 15   Yea 31,   Nay 11,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To printer.

Mar 17, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 27, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 30, 2009

  • Read second time.

Mar 31, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 01, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 02, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 09, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 10, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 13, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 14, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 15, 2009

Apr 16, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary.
  • Action of referral rescinded.
  • Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)