AB495
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 23, 2009.
By: Judiciary

Makes various changes to provisions governing professional negligence. (BDR 3-978)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 23, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 06, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 10, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 20   Yea 26,   Nay 15,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.409   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 24, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 17, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 409.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2009

Apr 21, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)