SB359
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 23, 2009.
By: Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation

Requires certain governmental entities to work cooperatively to establish the Henderson to North Las Vegas Fixed Guideway Corridor. (BDR S-1238)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Mar. 27, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Apr. 02, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Apr. 08, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Not Heard

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To printer.

Mar 24, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)