SB372
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 23, 2009.
By: Judiciary

Revises the Nevada Clean Indoor Air Act. (BDR 15-1099)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 02, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 03, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 08, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 13, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 17   Yea 14,   Nay 5,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 2,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.305   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 24, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 13, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 14, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 305.) To printer.

Apr 15, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 16, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 17, 2009

Apr 20, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)