SB374
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 23, 2009.
By: Natural Resources

Creates the Legislative Committee to Oversee the Southern Nevada Water Authority. (BDR S-848)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr. 02, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 21, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 24, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 30, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)