SB394
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 23, 2009.
By: Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation

Makes various changes to provisions relating to off-highway vehicles. (BDR 43-501)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 504.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Mar. 27, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Apr. 02, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Apr. 07, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Apr. 10, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Senate Finance     May. 04, 2009     04:00 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Transportation     May. 19, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 20, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 16   Yea 17,   Nay 1,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 1
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 21   Yea 34,   Nay 6,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Votes in Response to Governor's Veto  (2/3 Majority Required)
   Senate Override (Not Sustain)    (2nd Reprint)       May. 31   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Override (Not Sustain)    (2nd Reprint)       May. 31   Yea 36,   Nay 6,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.234     Amend. No.879   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To printer.

Mar 24, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 02, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 13, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 14, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 234.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 15, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 16, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 1, Absent: 1, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 19, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

May 21, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 879.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 6, Excused: 2.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.

May 22, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 879 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 23, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 26, 2009

  • Vetoed by the Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Returned to Senate with Governor's veto message.

May 31, 2009

Jun 01, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 02, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • Chapter 504.
  • Sections 19.5, 62.5 and 63 effective May 31, 2009 . Sections 1 to 19, inclusive, and 20 to 62, inclusive, effective May 31, 2009 for the purposes of: The appointment by the Governor of the members of the Commission on Off-Highway Vehicles created by section 16 of this act; and The adoption of regulations to carry out the provisions of this act. On July 1, 2011, or 1 year after the date the Interim Finance Committee issues a notice to the Department of Motor Vehicles pursuant to section 62.5 of this act, whichever occurs first, for all other purposes. Sections 1 to 62.5, inclusive, and 63 expire by limitation July 1, 2011, if the Interim Finance Committee has not issued a notice to the Department of Motor Vehicles pursuant to section 62.5 of this act before that date. Except as otherwise provided in subsection 3, sections 24 and 25 of this act expire by limitation on the date on which the provisions of 42 U.S.C. § 666 requiring each state to establish procedures under which the state has authority to withold or suspend, or restrict the use of professional, occupational and recreational licenses of persons who: Have failed to comply with a subpoena or warrant relating to a proceeding to determine the paternity of a child or to establish or enforce an obligation for the support of a child; or Are in arrears in the payment for the support of one or more children, are repealed by the Congress of the United States.