AB42
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 06, 2008.
By: Judiciary

Grants administrative subpoena power for the Medicaid Fraud Control Unit within the Office of the Attorney General to obtain certain records and materials. (BDR 18-273)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb. 06, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 12, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Not Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 13, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.60   

Bill History

Dec 06, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Dec 07, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 13, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 60.) To printer.

Apr 14, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 22, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)