AB49
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 06, 2008.
By: Government Affairs

Authorizes a board of county commissioners, under certain circumstances, to provide a civil penalty in lieu of a criminal penalty for the violation of certain ordinances. (BDR 20-449)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 115.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Feb. 19, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 08, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr. 27, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr. 29, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 10   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May. 12   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Dec 06, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Dec 07, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 09, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 10, 2009

Apr 13, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

Apr 30, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 01, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 02, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 04, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 05, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 06, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 08, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 11, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 12, 2009

May 13, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 15, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 19, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 115.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.