SB427
Introduced in the Senate on May 19, 2009.
By: Finance

Revises provisions governing public employees. (BDR 23-1290)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 426.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     May. 21, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     May. 28, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 28, 2009     10:00 AM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 28   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 28   Yea 19,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.968   

Bill History

May 19, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

May 20, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

May 28, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 968.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

May 29, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 01, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 03, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 426.
  • Sections 5 and 17 effective June 3, 2009. Sections 1 to 4.7, inclusive, and 6 to 16, inclusive effective January 1, 2010.