AB57
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 09, 2008.
By: Commerce and Labor

Prohibits certain activities related to the solicitation of an accident victim on behalf of a legal or health care practitioner. (BDR 57-445)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb. 16, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Dec 09, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Dec 11, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)