AB58
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 09, 2008.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Koivisto

Revises provisions governing residential landlords and tenants. (BDR 10-636)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb. 06, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 06, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Dec 09, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Dec 11, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)