AB66
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 11, 2008.
By: Government Affairs

Authorizes the governing body of a city to adopt an ordinance requiring the registration of vacant dwellings and buildings. (BDR 21-401)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Feb. 05, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 09, 2009     09:30 AM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Dec 11, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Dec 12, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time.
  • Action of referral rescinded.
  • Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)