AB67
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 12, 2008.
By: Government Affairs

Authorizes boards of county commissioners to levy an ad valorem tax to pay the costs of public safety, health and welfare services. (BDR 31-460)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Feb. 25, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Dec 12, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Concurrent Committees on Government Affairs and Taxation. To printer.

Dec 15, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committees.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)