AB69
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 12, 2008.
By: Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining

Revises provisions governing the licensure of persons who sell nursery stock. (BDR 49-357)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Feb. 18, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Mar. 02, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar. 23, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Dec 12, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer.

Dec 15, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 02, 2009

  • Notice of exemption.

Mar 03, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 04, 2009

  • Read second time.

Mar 05, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 06, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 09, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 10, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 11, 2009

  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)