SB72
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 15, 2008.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Cegavske

Authorizes a registered pharmacist or a registered intern pharmacist to perform certain screening tests. (BDR 54-376)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 204.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Feb. 18, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 23, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 01, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 13, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 20   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 18   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.461   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Dec 17, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 461.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 21, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 18, 2009

May 19, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 20, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 26, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 204.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.