SB73
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 15, 2008.
By: Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation

Revises provisions governing energy conservation and efficiency standards. (BDR 58-438)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 245.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Feb. 06, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Apr. 01, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Apr. 07, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 06, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 15, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 17   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 22   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.239   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To printer.

Dec 17, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 15, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 16, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 239.) To printer.

Apr 17, 2009

Apr 20, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 18, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 20, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 21, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2009

May 23, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 245.
  • Effective May 28, 2009.