SB76
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 15, 2008.
By: Government Affairs

Revises provisions governing the administrative procedures for the summary suspension of licenses issued by certain state agencies. (BDR 18-263)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 179.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Feb. 09, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Feb. 16, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Feb. 23, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 28, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Government Affairs     May. 08, 2009     10:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 13   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 12   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.9   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Dec 17, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 06, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 08, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 9.) To printer.

Apr 09, 2009

Apr 13, 2009

Apr 14, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 08, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 12, 2009

May 15, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 17, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 22, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 179.
  • Effective May 22, 2009.