SB79
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 15, 2008.
By: Health and Education

Revises provisions governing various commissions, boards and committees relating to health. (BDR 38-327)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 181.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Education     Feb. 11, 2009     03:15 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Mar. 23, 2009     03:15 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Education     Mar. 25, 2009     02:30 PM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 08, 2009     02:30 PM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May. 06, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May. 12, 2009     07:00 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 16   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 16   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.137   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer.

Dec 17, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 14, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 15, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 137.) To printer.

Apr 16, 2009

Apr 17, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 13, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 15, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 16, 2009

May 18, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 19, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 22, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 181.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.