SB81
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 15, 2008.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Cegavske

Establishes the Special Needs Scholarship Program. (BDR 34-15)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Mar. 02, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Dec 15, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Dec 17, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 24, 2009

  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)