SB82
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 15, 2008.
By: Judiciary

Makes various changes relating to prepaid or stored value cards. (BDR 14-266)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 404.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 05, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 26, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 19, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 26, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 01, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 07, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 14, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May. 28, 2009     12:30 PM    Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 16   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 20   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.109     Amend. No.733   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Dec 17, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 14, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 15, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 109.) To printer.

Apr 16, 2009

Apr 17, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 19, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 733.) To printer.

May 20, 2009

May 21, 2009

  • In Senate.

May 28, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 733 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 29, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 404.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.