SB6
Introduced in the Senate on Nov 24, 2008.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Lee

Revises provisions regarding occupational diseases of volunteer firefighters. (BDR 53-46)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 201.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Feb. 09, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Feb. 18, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 23, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 29, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 08, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 13, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 20   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 18   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.113   

Bill History

Nov 24, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nov 26, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 19, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 17, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 113.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2009

Apr 21, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 18, 2009

May 19, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 20, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 26, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 201.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.