AB82
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 15, 2008.
By: Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments

Makes various changes relating to elections. (BDR 24-417)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Mar. 03, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar. 10, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Mar. 31, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr. 07, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr. 09, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended and rerefer
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 29, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 18, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 19, 2009     09:30 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 26, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 30, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 21   Yea 23,   Nay 18,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       Jun. 01   Yea 16,   Nay 5,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.405     Amend. No.885     Amend. No.1017     Amend. No.1014   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To printer.

Dec 17, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 17, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 405.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.

May 21, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 885.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 23, Nays: 18, Excused: 1.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

Jun 01, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 1014 and 1017.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 5.)
  • To printer.

Jun 09, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • (No further action taken.)