AB84
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 15, 2008.
By: Commerce and Labor

Revises provisions governing compensation. (BDR 53-546)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 445.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb. 13, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 13, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 10, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 29, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 15, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 28, 2009     06:55 PM    Minutes          Do not recede

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 20   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 20   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.430     Amend. No.773     Amend. No.CA23   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Dec 17, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 430.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.)
  • To printer.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 18, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 19, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 773.) To printer.

May 20, 2009

May 21, 2009

  • In Assembly.

May 27, 2009

  • Senate Amendment No. 773 not concurred in. To Senate.

May 28, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Senate Amendment No. 773 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.

May 29, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.

May 31, 2009

  • From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 773 and further amend. Conference report adopted by Assembly.

Jun 01, 2009

  • Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • To enrollment.

Jun 02, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 04, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 445.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.