AB90
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 15, 2008.
By: Commerce and Labor

Revises certain provisions concerning the investigation and prosecution of deceptive trade practices. (BDR 52-269)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 280.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb. 04, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 30, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 20, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 08, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 09   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 21   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.155     Amend. No.651   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Dec 17, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 06, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 155.) To printer.

Apr 07, 2009

Apr 09, 2009

Apr 13, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 19, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 20, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 651.) To printer.

May 21, 2009

May 22, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 651 concurred in. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 280.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.