SB8
Introduced in the Senate on Nov 24, 2008.
By: Commerce and Labor

Makes various changes related to members of certain medical boards. (BDR 54-216)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 251.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 30, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 08, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 10, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 04, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 15, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 20   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 19   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.418   

Bill History

Nov 24, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nov 26, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 418.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 21, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 18, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 19, 2009

May 20, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 22, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 251.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.