SB92
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 15, 2008.
By: Government Affairs

Makes various changes relating to the regulation of notaries public. (BDR 19-414)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 499.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Feb. 16, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Feb. 23, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 27, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Government Affairs     May. 14, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Government Affairs     May. 27, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     May. 28, 2009     12:20 PM    Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 08   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 20   Yea 40,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.10     Amend. No.735   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Dec 17, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 02, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 10.) To printer.

Apr 07, 2009

Apr 08, 2009

Apr 09, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 19, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 735.) To printer.

May 20, 2009

May 21, 2009

  • In Senate.

May 28, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 735 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 29, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 09, 2009

  • Chapter 499.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.