AB91
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 15, 2008.
By: Government Affairs

Authorizes the State Treasurer to securitize the revenue stream produced by the Tobacco Master Settlement Agreement. (BDR 18-508)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 03, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Withdrawn

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Dec 15, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Dec 17, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)