AB98
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 15, 2008.
By: Taxation

Requires certain county fair and recreation boards to remit to the city of origin unobligated room tax revenues attributable to new transient lodging. (BDR 20-505)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Mar. 24, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Dec 15, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Dec 17, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)