SB104
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 15, 2008.
By: Legislative Operations and Elections

Makes various changes relating to ethics in government. (BDR 23-418)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Feb. 05, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Ways and Means     Feb. 23, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Feb. 24, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Dec 15, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Dec 17, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)