SB11
Introduced in the Senate on Nov 24, 2008.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Care

Prohibits the county commissioners of certain larger counties from holding certain other employment. (BDR 20-80)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar. 25, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr. 01, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Nov 24, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nov 26, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 08, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 13, 2009

  • Read second time.

Apr 14, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Apr 22, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)