SB107
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 31, 2008.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy

Limits the liability of certain nonprofit organizations and their agents, employees and volunteers under certain circumstances. (BDR 3-650)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 11, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 26, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Amendment proposed, failed

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Dec 31, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Jan 02, 2009

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)