SJR2* of the 74th Session
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 02, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Raggio , Hardy , Care , Coffin , Carlton , Amodei , Mathews , Nolan , Titus , Townsend

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to revise provisions relating to the selection of justices and judges. (BDR C-177)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
File No. 87.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 23, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     Mar. 09, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 12, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr. 30, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     May. 12, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar. 25   Yea 14,   Nay 7,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May. 20   Yea 29,   Nay 13,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Feb 02, 2009

  • Returned from Secretary of State.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 13, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read second time.

Mar 17, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 19, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 24, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 25, 2009

Mar 27, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To committee.

May 13, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 15, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 16, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2009

May 21, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 22, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • File No. 87.
  • (On 2010 Ballot)