SJR9* of the 74th Session
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 02, 2009.
By: Judiciary

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to allow the Legislature to establish an intermediate appellate court. (BDR C-661)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
File No. 57.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 04, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 19, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Mar. 26, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Feb. 24   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 27   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Feb 02, 2009

  • Returned from Secretary of State.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
  • From printer. To committee.

Feb 19, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Feb 20, 2009

  • Read second time.

Feb 23, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Feb 24, 2009

Feb 25, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To committee.

Mar 27, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 30, 2009

  • Read second time.

Mar 31, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 01, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 02, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 09, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 10, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 13, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 14, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 15, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 16, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 17, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 20, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 21, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 22, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 23, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 24, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 27, 2009

Apr 28, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Apr 29, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • File No. 57.
  • (On 2010 Ballot)