SB112
Introduced in the Senate on Jan 23, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Carlton

Revises provisions relating to the provision of health benefits by employee leasing companies. (BDR 53-622)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Feb. 23, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 23, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 03, 2009     12:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 08, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Jan 23, 2009

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Jan 26, 2009

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)