AB112
Introduced in the Assembly on Jan 23, 2009.
By: Health and Human Services

Establishes provisions relating to the coordinated response to public health emergencies and other health events. (BDR 40-214)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 98.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar. 09, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr. 08, 2009     01:00 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Education     May. 06, 2009     03:15 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 17   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 12   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.475   

Bill History

Jan 23, 2009

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Jan 26, 2009

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 02, 2009

  • Notice of exemption.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Amended Notice of Exemption: Eligible for Exemption.

Apr 16, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 475.) To printer.

Apr 17, 2009

Apr 20, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To committee.

May 08, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 11, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 12, 2009

May 13, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 15, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 18, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 98.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.