AB121
Introduced in the Assembly on Jan 27, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Koivisto

Makes various changes concerning health care facilities that employ nurses. (BDR 40-492)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 380.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar. 25, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr. 09, 2009     11:35 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Education     May. 01, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     May. 06, 2009     03:15 PM    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Health and Education     May. 11, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Health and Education     May. 14, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 20   Yea 41,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 16   Yea 14,   Nay 5,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Votes in Response to Governor's Veto  (2/3 Majority Required)
   Senate Override (Not Sustain)    (1st Reprint)       May. 31   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Override (Not Sustain)    (1st Reprint)       May. 31   Yea 37,   Nay 5,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.470   

Bill History

Jan 27, 2009

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Jan 28, 2009

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 02, 2009

  • Notice of exemption.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Amended Notice of Exemption: Eligible for Exemption.

Apr 17, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 470.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2009

Apr 21, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To committee.

May 08, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 11, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 12, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 15, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 16, 2009

May 18, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 23, 2009

  • Vetoed by the Governor.

May 30, 2009

  • Returned to Assembly.

May 31, 2009

Jun 01, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • Chapter 380.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.